AZ SB1546 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2757
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tax provisions; omnibus
Title
Tax provisions; omnibus
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2757 (Replaced by) 2019-05-31 - Chapter 273
Subjects
Applicability
Budget Bills
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Conditional Enactment
Definitions
Dependent Tax Credit
Legislative Intent
Marketplace Facilitators
Omnibus
Remote Sellers
Repeal
Retroactivity
Tax Provisions
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Budget Bills
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Conditional Enactment
Definitions
Dependent Tax Credit
Legislative Intent
Marketplace Facilitators
Omnibus
Remote Sellers
Repeal
Retroactivity
Tax Provisions
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5042 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5043 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6017 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1043 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1072.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1073.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1098 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 945 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 491.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |