AZ HB2757 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1546

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Chapter 273
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tax provisions; omnibus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax provisions; omnibus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Motion HB 2757 substituted for SB 1546. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateChapter 273
2019-05-31SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-27HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
2019-05-27SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HB 2757 substituted for SB 1546. Motion carried.
2019-05-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-05-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2019-05-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-05-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse read second time
2019-05-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
2019-05-22HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-4-0-0-0-0)
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-05-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1546 (Replaces) 2019-05-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
421001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
421108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425042New CodeSee Bill Text
425043New CodeSee Bill Text
425061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425159Amended CodeSee Bill Text
426002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
426017New CodeSee Bill Text
431001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431043Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
43105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431072.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431073.01New CodeSee Bill Text
431095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431098Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
431122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43323Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43945Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9491.02New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72436
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2757p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2757h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0273.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72436&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72436&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72436&billStatusActionId=189793&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72436&billStatusActionId=189803&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72436&billStatusActionId=189890&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72436&billStatusActionId=189898&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback