AZ SB1526 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prisoners; training; individual certificates
Title
Prisoners; training; individual certificates
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Navarrete [D] | Sen. Lela Alston [D] | Rep. Lupe Contreras [D] | Sen. Sally Gonzales [D] |
Sen. Juan Mendez [D] | Sen. Martin Quezada [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rios [D] | Sen. Victoria Steele [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Motion Representative Toma moved that pursuant to Rule 12(O), Senate Bill 1526 be calendared for Additional Committee of the Whole. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Motion Representative Toma moved that pursuant to Rule 12(O), Senate Bill 1526 be calendared for Additional Committee of the Whole. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Governor Vetoed | |
2021-05-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (19-11-0-0) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-05-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-6-1-0) |
2021-05-13 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-05-13 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-08 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Certification
Dignity For Incarcerated Women Act
Individual Certificates
Inmate Training
Pregnant Prisoners (h)
Pregnant Women (h)
Prisoners
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Requirements
Training
Dignity For Incarcerated Women Act
Individual Certificates
Inmate Training
Pregnant Prisoners (h)
Pregnant Women (h)
Prisoners
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Requirements
Training
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 201.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 232 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 236 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 256 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |