AZ SB1498 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-23 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Risk management; state agency liability
Title
Risk management; state agency liability
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Risk Management
State Agencies (h)
State Agency Liability
State Government - Title 41
Risk Management
State Agencies (h)
State Agency Liability
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 820.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 820.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 621 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 621.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 622.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |