AZ SB1486 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Drug paraphernalia; definition; testing equipment
Title
Drug paraphernalia; definition; testing equipment
Sponsors
Sen. Christine Marsh [D] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] | Rep. Randall Friese [D] | Rep. Melody Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Amish Shah [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Chapter 372 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-05-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-11-1-0) |
2021-04-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-04-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-22 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |