AZ SB1476 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Agricultural workforce; interns; appropriation
Title
Agricultural workforce; interns; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-7-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate WAG Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WAG Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Agricultural Workforce
Agriculture - Title 3
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Department Of Agriculture
Effective Date
Interns
Agriculture - Title 3
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Department Of Agriculture
Effective Date
Interns