AZ SB1476 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Homeowners' associations; review; construction
Title
Homeowners' associations; review; construction
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Gould [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Governor Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-24 | Senate final reading , voting: (27-1-2-0) | |
2012-04-24 | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-04-12 | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-5-9-0) | |
2012-04-11 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-29 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-15 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2012-03-12 | House read second time | |
2012-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-16 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-16 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-5-0-0) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Consent Calendar February 13, 2012 @ 1:30 PM | |
2012-02-14 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-14 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |