AZ SB1419 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor licenses; stores; proximity exemption
Title
Liquor licenses; stores; proximity exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Dial [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2015-03-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | House JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-2-0-0-0) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-9-0-0) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |