AZ SB1402 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Controlled substances; schedule designations
Title
Controlled substances; schedule designations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-03-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Controlled Substances
Controlled Substances Act
Criminal Code - Title 13
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Scheduled Designations
Controlled Substances Act
Criminal Code - Title 13
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Scheduled Designations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3412.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1969 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2933 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2514 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2516 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |