AZ SB1402 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates
Title
Special license plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Senate final reading , voting: (22-8-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-18 | House third reading , voting: (31-28-1-0) | |
2011-04-13 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-11 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-3-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-04-06 | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-24 | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-03-15 | House read second time | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Consent Calendar February 14, 2011 @ 1:30 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-17 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-0-0) | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |