AZ SB1402 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Special districts; secondary levy limits
Title
Special districts; secondary levy limits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-15 | Senate Consent Calendar February 15, 2010 @ 2:25 PM with Objections | |
2010-02-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-15 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0) | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |