AZ SB1385 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-14 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-14 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Aggravated assault; school grounds
Title
Aggravated assault; school grounds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |