AZ SB1292 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reading proficiency; dyslexia; literacy; appropriation
Title
Reading proficiency; dyslexia; literacy; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-8-0-0) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Department Of Education
Dyslexia
Dyslexia Specialist
Literacy Services
Appropriation
Department Of Education
Dyslexia
Dyslexia Specialist
Literacy Services