AZ SB1291 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Duty to report abuse; exception
Title
Duty to report abuse; exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Governor Signed | |
2013-04-30 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-04-23 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-04-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2013-04-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-21 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | House read second time |
2013-03-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |