AZ SB1280 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Chapter 11
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Chapter 11
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; sex offender registry
Title
School boards; sex offender registry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 11 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-04 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-27 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Definitions
Education - Title 15
Members
Powers And Duties
Qualifications
School Boards
School District Governing Boards
Sex Offender Registry
Education - Title 15
Members
Powers And Duties
Qualifications
School Boards
School District Governing Boards
Sex Offender Registry
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |