AZ SB1263 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Transmit to Senate
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Transmit to Senate
Summary
High schools; military recruiting; form
Title
High schools; military recruiting; form
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | House third reading PASSED, voting: (23-5-1-0) | |
2010-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-11 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2010-02-09 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to House Committee | |
2010-02-01 | House read second time | |
2010-03-03 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-03 | Senate third reading PASSED, voting: (23-5-1-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2010-02-09 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-08 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Arizona State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Bill_Number=SB1263 |