AZ SB1246 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child support; supreme court; factors
Title
Child support; supreme court; factors
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-28 | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-1-3-0) | |
2012-03-19 | House Consent Calendar March 19, 2012 @ 4:40 PM | |
2012-03-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-08 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-02 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-03-02 | House read second time | |
2012-03-01 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-27 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-27 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Senate PSHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |