AZ SB1244 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-14 - Referred to House ERA Committee
Pending: House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-14 - Referred to House ERA Committee
Pending: House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Security guard agency license; qualifications
Title
Security guard agency license; qualifications
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Referred to House ERA Committee | |
2012-03-14 | House MAPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-28 | House read second time | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to House ERA Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-20 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-20 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-1-4-0) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Consent Calendar February 13, 2012 @ 1:30 PM with Objections | |
2012-02-14 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-14 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |