AZ SB1230 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Chapter 309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Chapter 309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Limited liability companies
Title
Limited liability companies
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Pace [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Chapter 309 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-23 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Corporate Name (h)
Corporations And Associations - Title 10
Cpa (h)
Exemption (h)
Filings (h)
Foreign Corporation (h)
Function (h)
Insurance - Title 20
Limitations (h)
Limited Liability Companies
Partnership - Title 29
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Access Fund (h)
Redomestication (h)
Statutory Agent
Transferable Interest
Corporations And Associations - Title 10
Cpa (h)
Exemption (h)
Filings (h)
Foreign Corporation (h)
Function (h)
Insurance - Title 20
Limitations (h)
Limited Liability Companies
Partnership - Title 29
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Access Fund (h)
Redomestication (h)
Statutory Agent
Transferable Interest
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 11506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
10 | 122.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
10 | 1506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
10 | 3401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
10 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1098.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 2105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 2406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 3105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 3110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 3601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 3602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 3708 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 731 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 747 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |