AZ SB1214 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2381
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
PSPRS; CORP; local boards; consolidation.
Title
PSPRS; CORP; local boards; consolidation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2381 (Replaced by) 2021-02-24 - Chapter 34
Subjects
Administrators
Application
Benefits
Board Of Trustees
Consolidation
Corp
Definitions
Disability
Disability Decisions
Duties
Effective Date
Employer Responsibilities
Employers
In The Line Of Duty Death
Independent Legal Counsel
Local Boards
Members
Membership
Psprs
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Public Retirement System
Retirement Application
Retirement Benefits
Uniform Medical Review
Voluntary Consolidation
Application
Benefits
Board Of Trustees
Consolidation
Corp
Definitions
Disability
Disability Decisions
Duties
Effective Date
Employer Responsibilities
Employers
In The Line Of Duty Death
Independent Legal Counsel
Local Boards
Members
Membership
Psprs
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Public Retirement System
Retirement Application
Retirement Benefits
Uniform Medical Review
Voluntary Consolidation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 802.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 847 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 847.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 847.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 847.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 893 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 893.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |