AZ HB2381 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1214
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Chapter 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Chapter 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
PSPRS; CORP; local boards; consolidation
Title
PSPRS; CORP; local boards; consolidation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Motion HB 2381 substituted for SB 1214. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Motion HB 2381 substituted for SB 1214. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Chapter 34 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2381 substituted for SB 1214. Motion carried. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1214 (Replaces) 2021-02-03 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
Consolidation
Corp
Effective Date
Local Boards
Psprs
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Public Retirement System
Corp
Effective Date
Local Boards
Psprs
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Public Retirement System
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 802.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 847 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 847.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 847.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 847.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 893 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 893.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |