AZ SB1167 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Israel boycott divestments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Israel boycott divestments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House State & International Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 94
2019-04-16SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-10SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-10SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (19-10-1-0)
2019-04-10SenateSenate concurs
2019-04-10SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-10SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-09SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-04-08HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (37-21-2-0)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-01HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-20HouseHouse SIA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House SIA Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-13HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (22-8-0-0)
2019-02-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2019-02-05SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-05SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-04SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-01-31SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-1-0)
2019-01-28SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-24SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-24SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
35393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35393.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
35393.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71722
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1167p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1167s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1167h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0094.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1167rivero.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1167state international affairs.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71722&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71722&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71722&billStatusActionId=186119&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71722&billStatusActionId=186266&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71722&billStatusActionId=186335&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71722&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71722&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71722&billStatusActionId=188849&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71722&billStatusActionId=188852&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71722&billStatusActionId=188889&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71722&billStatusActionId=188894&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback