AZ SB1149 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; DUI; blood test
Title
Technical correction; DUI; blood test
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Worsley [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Blood Test
Department Of Health Services
Department Of Public Safety
Driving
Driving Under The Influence
Dui
Technical Correction
Transportation
Department Of Health Services
Department Of Public Safety
Driving
Driving Under The Influence
Dui
Technical Correction
Transportation