AZ SB1144 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
TPT exemptions and deductions; sunset
Title
TPT exemptions and deductions; sunset
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Joint Legislative Income Tax Credit Review Committee
Sunrise Review
Sunset
Tax Deduction
Tax Exemptions
Tax Expenditure
Taxation
Taxation Of Income
Tpt
Tpt Deductions
Tpt Exemptions
Transaction Privilege Tax
Joint Legislative Income Tax Credit Review Committee
Sunrise Review
Sunset
Tax Deduction
Tax Exemptions
Tax Expenditure
Taxation
Taxation Of Income
Tpt
Tpt Deductions
Tpt Exemptions
Transaction Privilege Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 5042 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |