AZ SB1120 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - House APPROP Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - House APPROP Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Fine art; TPT; exemption
Title
Fine art; TPT; exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Held |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0-0) |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-9-2-0) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (3-2-0-0) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |