AZ SB1059 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - House LARA Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - House LARA Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Animal shelter; rescue organization; definition
Title
Animal shelter; rescue organization; definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | House LARA Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-08 | House | House read second time |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-03-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-4-2-0) |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adopt
Animal Shelter
Counties - Title 11
Definition
Definitions
Handling Of Animals
Impounded Cats
Impounded Dogs
Organization
Rescue
Rescue Organization (h)
Sell
Sterilization
Animal Shelter
Counties - Title 11
Definition
Definitions
Handling Of Animals
Impounded Cats
Impounded Dogs
Organization
Rescue
Rescue Organization (h)
Sell
Sterilization