AZ SB1044 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Massage therapy board
Title
Massage therapy board
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | Governor Signed | |
2013-04-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (22-5-3-0) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-26 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-03-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (45-12-3-0) |
2013-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-2-0) |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-18 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2013-02-18 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-02-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |