AZ SB1042 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; fee schedule; settings
Title
Workers' compensation; fee schedule; settings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Chapter 204 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-04-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-25 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Prefile |