AZ SB1010 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - House third reading FAILED voting: (33-27-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Medical marijuana dispensaries; inspections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana dispensaries; inspections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-19HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (33-27-0-0)
2020-05-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2020-05-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-05-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-05-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2020-03-12HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0-0)
2020-03-05HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-04HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-03-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-02-27HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2020-02-25SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-25SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-02-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-20SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2020-01-14SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-11-15SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362806Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72489
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1010p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1010s.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72489&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72489&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72489&billStatusActionId=194521&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72489&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72489&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72489&billStatusActionId=196282&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72489&billStatusActionId=196302&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback