AZ SB1010 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Reviser's technical corrections; 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reviser's technical corrections; 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - House of Representatives - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House of Representatives - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (DP/PFC) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-21SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-20SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-03-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0)
2017-03-14HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-14HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-13HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-03-07HouseHouse read second time
2017-03-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-03-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-01-23HouseTransmit to House
2017-01-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2017-01-17SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-17SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-17SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Do pass and proper for consideration, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-01-10SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-09SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-12-14SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10130Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282055Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
35319Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
412501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425159Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491201Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback