AZ HCR2028 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Election of judges; terms
Title
Election of judges; terms
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-03-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-1-0) |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |