AZ HCR2027 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting refugees.
Title
Supporting refugees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House State & International Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House State & International Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | House | House SIA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House SIA Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |