AZ HCR2002 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 7th Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Land conservation fund; reversion
Title
Land conservation fund; reversion
Sponsors
Rep. Kirk Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2010-03-12 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-11 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-10-3-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-11 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-0-0) | |
2010-03-11 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-03-09 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-09 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-09 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-09 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-03-09 | House read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time |