AZ HCM2006 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Toxic exposure; urging Congress
Title
Toxic exposure; urging Congress
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate FMFR Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FMFR Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-4-3-0) |
2016-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to House MAPS Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |