AZ HB2923 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Legislation replaced by SB1835

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2923 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Party representative; resident; violation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Party representative; resident; violation

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25HouseHouse miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2923 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
2021-06-15HouseHouse read second time
2021-06-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1835 (Replaced by) 2021-06-29 - Chapter 388

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16590Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback