AZ SB1835 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2923
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Chapter 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Party representative; resident; violation.
Title
Party representative; resident; violation.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1835 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Motion Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1835 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | Chapter 388 |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-06-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-25-4-0) |
2021-06-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: Senator Gray moved in accordance with Senate Rule 28B, I move to suspend Senate Rules 2J, 8A and B and notwithstanding Senate Rule 16, for the purpose of placing Senate Bill 1835 on the order of business, Third Reading of Bills. Motion carried. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2923 (Replaces) 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2923 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Subjects
Election Official
Election Official (h)
Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Party Representative
Resident
Violations
Election Official (h)
Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Party Representative
Resident
Violations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 590 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |