AZ HB2739 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - House third reading FAILED voting: (30-29-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - House third reading FAILED voting: (30-29-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School board associations; open meetings
Title
School board associations; open meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (30-29-1-0) |
2022-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-1-0-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 120.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |