AZ HB2729 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State regulation of firearms
Title
State regulation of firearms
Sponsors
Rep. John Allen [R] | Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Sen. Andy Biggs [R] |
Sen. Chester Crandell [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. Eddie Farnsworth [R] | Rep. John Fillmore [R] |
Sen. Ron Gould [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Jack Harper [R] |
Rep. Peggy Judd [R] | Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Sen. Lori Klein [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] |
Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Sen. Rick Murphy [R] | Rep. Justin Olson [R] |
Rep. Justin Pierce [R] | Rep. Terri Proud [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Rep. David Smith [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] | Rep. Steve Urie [R] |
Rep. James Weiers [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Governor Vetoed | |
2012-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-12 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-12 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-11-0-0) | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-04-02 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-02 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-02 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-21-2-0) | |
2012-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-21 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-15 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-08 | House read second time | |
2012-02-07 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced in House and read first time |