AZ HB2712 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Senate TAT Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Senate TAT Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Highway alignments; environmental impact statement
Title
Highway alignments; environmental impact statement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-1-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2021-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-1-1-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Delayed Repeal
Environmental Impact Statement
Highway Alignments
State Highways
Transportation - Title 28
Environmental Impact Statement
Highway Alignments
State Highways
Transportation - Title 28