AZ HB2687 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - Referred to Senate JUD Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - Referred to Senate JUD Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Salvia divinorum; unlawful acts
Title
Salvia divinorum; unlawful acts
Sponsors
Sen. Olivia Bedford [D] | Rep. Cloves Campbell [D] | Rep. David Lujan [D] | Rep. Eric Meyer [D] |
Rep. Rae Waters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-24 | House third reading , voting: (53-1-6-0) | |
2010-03-08 | House Consent Calendar March 08, 2010 @ 3:00 PM | |
2010-03-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-25 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-02-11 | House read second time | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Introduced in House and read first time |