AZ HB2667 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-31 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Dental care; treatment; volunteer care
Title
Dental care; treatment; volunteer care
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-03-02 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-4-2-0) |
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |