AZ HB2604 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Solid waste; private enterprise.
Title
Solid waste; private enterprise.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Sen. Ron Gould [R] | Rep. Jack Harper [R] |
Rep. Laurin Hendrix [R] | Rep. Russell Jones [R] | Sen. John Kavanagh [R] | Sen. Rick Murphy [R] |
Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Governor Signed | |
2010-03-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-03-08 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-03 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | House third reading , voting: (52-8-0-0) | |
2010-02-25 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-02-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-09 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-01 | House read second time | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced in House and read first time |