AZ HB2601 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Kratom products; definitions
Title
Kratom products; definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 253 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-20-2-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-14 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-02-09 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-3-0-0-0) |
2022-01-31 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 795 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 795. | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 795.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 795.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |