AZ HB2586 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Referred to Senate PSMT Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Referred to Senate PSMT Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Dependency; households; felony reports
Title
Dependency; households; felony reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Children and Family Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Children and Family Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-03-02 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-13-1-0) |
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-15 | House | House CFA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to House CFA Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Assigned to House CFA Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |