AZ HB2539 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - Referred to Senate JUD Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - Referred to Senate JUD Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public sale of animals
Title
Public sale of animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-01 | House third reading , voting: (40-17-3-0) | |
2011-02-23 | House Consent Calendar February 23, 2011 @ 3:31 PM | |
2011-02-24 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-21 | House COM Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2011-02-17 | House AW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to House AW Committee | |
2011-01-27 | House read second time | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to House AW Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced in House and read first time |