AZ HB2537 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1522

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

General appropriations act; 2017-2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General appropriations act; 2017-2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - House - Epstein to include Epstein Floor Amendment to the Bill (Y: 24 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-05-05HouseHouse motion to amend
2017-05-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-04HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-03HouseHouse read second time
2017-05-03HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0)
2017-05-03HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-4-0-2-0-0)
2017-05-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-05-02HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2017-05-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1522 (Replaces) 2017-05-12 - Chapter 305

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69570
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2537p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2537h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2537fernandez.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2537friese.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69570&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69570&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69570&billStatusActionId=177468&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69570&billStatusActionId=177467&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback