AZ SB1522 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Legislation has been replaced by HB2537

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Chapter 305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

General appropriations act; 2017-2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General appropriations act; 2017-2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Amend (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Amend (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Amend (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateChapter 305
2017-05-12SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-08SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-08SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-05-05HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0)
2017-05-04HouseTransmit to House
2017-05-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2017-05-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-05-04SenateSenate motion to amend
2017-05-04SenateSenate motion to amend
2017-05-04SenateSenate motion to amend
2017-05-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2017-05-04SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-04SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-04SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-05-03SenateSenate read second time
2017-05-03SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2017-05-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2537 (Replaced by) 2017-05-05 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69581
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1522p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1522s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0305.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1522flooryarbrough3.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1522446ocb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1522551mq.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1522cajerobedford933.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1522dalessandro342.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1522farley246.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1522mendez728.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1522otondo501.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69581&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69581&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69581&billStatusActionId=177388&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69581&billStatusActionId=177410&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69581&billStatusActionId=177412&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69581&billStatusActionId=177413&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69581&billStatusActionId=177411&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69581&billStatusActionId=177420&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69581&billStatusActionId=177469&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback