AZ HB2528 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter 299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter 299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Index exemptions; unused tax credits
Title
Index exemptions; unused tax credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 299 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-04 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (38-21-1-0) |
2017-05-04 | House | House concurs |
2017-05-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-11-0-0) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 167 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 224.04 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1514.02 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1516 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1076 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1076.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1079 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1080 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1083.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1083.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1085.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1090 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1162 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1162.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1164.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1164.02 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1164.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1167 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1169 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1176 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 224 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |