AZ HB2501 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
PTSD; workers' compensation; presumption
Title
PTSD; workers' compensation; presumption
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Rep. Kevin Payne [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-2-1-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-08 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 1061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 1106 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 672 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |