AZ HB2423 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Chapter 98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Parents' rights; DCS website information

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parents' rights; DCS website information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29SenateChapter 98
2017-03-29SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-23HouseTransmit to House
2017-03-23SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2017-03-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-20SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-03-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-15SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-16HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-08HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411014New CodeSee Bill Text
8809New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69431
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2423p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2423h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0098.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69431&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69431&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69431&billStatusActionId=175369&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69431&billStatusActionId=175256&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69431&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69431&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69431&billStatusActionId=176652&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback